LA SR116 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/19/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/19/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Mayor Lawrence Henagan of Dequincy, Louisiana, upon his retirement.
Title
Commends Mayor Lawrence Henagan of Dequincy, Louisiana, upon his retirement.
Sponsors
Sen. John Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/19/2018. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |