LA SR111 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates Wednesday, May 15, 2024, as Coca-Cola Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.
Title
Designates Wednesday, May 15, 2024, as Coca-Cola Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |