LA SR111 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-6)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-16 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/13/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-6)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-16 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/13/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses condolences upon the death of Hokie Gajan, Louisiana football legend.
Title
Expresses condolences upon the death of Hokie Gajan, Louisiana football legend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SR 111 CO-AUTHORS (#648) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-16 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/13/2016. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |