LA SR11 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/31/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/31/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates Wednesday, April 13, 2022, as Children's Advocacy Centers (CACs) Day in Louisiana.
Title
Designates Wednesday, April 13, 2022, as Children's Advocacy Centers (CACs) Day in Louisiana.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/31/2022. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |