LA SCR98 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the law enforcement agencies of Louisiana to take advantage of the Attorney General's Drug Take Back Box program to receive free receptacles for the safe disposal of opioids.
Title
Requests the law enforcement agencies of Louisiana to take advantage of the Attorney General's Drug Take Back Box program to receive free receptacles for the safe disposal of opioids.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Mills [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on SCR 98 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1252) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 98 ADOPT (#897) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 98 ADOPT (#897) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2018-05-17 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 85 yeas, 0 nays. |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18. |
2018-05-10 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-09 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |