LA SCR97 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Commends the Braden family upon earning the Political Family of Officeholders Award.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commends the Braden family upon earning the Political Family of Officeholders Award.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 97 ADOPT (#632) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-07SenateSent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
2018-05-02HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-02SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-01SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2018-05-01HouseRead by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
2018-05-01HouseReceived in the House from the Senate.
2018-05-01SenateRead by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
2018-04-30SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback