LA SCR91 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a task force to study the advisability of creating a statewide business court.
Title
Creates a task force to study the advisability of creating a statewide business court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 91 ADOPT (#356) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2019-05-16 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |