LA SCR91 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on June 27.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on June 27.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Dr. Arnold Task on his retirement as Rabbi of the Gemiluth Chassodim Jewish Temple.
Title
Commends Dr. Arnold Task on his retirement as Rabbi of the Gemiluth Chassodim Jewish Temple.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 91, ADOPT (#841) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-23 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on June 27. | |
2011-06-23 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-23 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-22 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2011-06-22 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |
2011-06-21 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2011-06-21 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |
2011-06-20 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |