LA SCR67 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses condolences upon the death of Kirt Bennett, founder and executive director of The Young Leaders' Academy.
Title
Expresses condolences upon the death of Kirt Bennett, founder and executive director of The Young Leaders' Academy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 67, ADOPT (#467) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2010-05-10 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-05-10 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-05-05 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2010-05-05 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |
2010-05-04 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2010-05-04 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |