LA SCR6 | 2017 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-22 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 2/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Expresses condolences upon the death of public servant and former legislator, George Forrest Dunn Jr.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expresses condolences upon the death of public servant and former legislator, George Forrest Dunn Jr.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 6 ADOPT (#27) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-22SenateSent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 2/23/2017.
2017-02-19HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2017-02-19SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2017-02-16SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2017-02-15HouseRead by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
2017-02-15HouseReceived in the House from the Senate.
2017-02-15SenateRead by title and adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
2017-02-14SenateRules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback