LA SCR6 | 2016 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-09 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/16/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-09 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/16/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a task force to study ad valorem taxes that are offset by state tax credits.
Title
Establishes a task force to study ad valorem taxes that are offset by state tax credits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 6 CONCUR (#121) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House Vote on SCR 6 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#114) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 6 FINAL PASSAGE (#50) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House Vote on SCR 6 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#114) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 6 FINAL PASSAGE (#50) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/16/2016. |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 3/10/2016. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2016-03-08 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 94 yeas, 1 nay. |
2016-03-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/08/2016. |
2016-03-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/07/2016. |
2016-03-04 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2016-03-03 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 24 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2016-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |