LA SCR26 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-23 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/20.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-23 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/20.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes May 2011 as Amyotrophic Lateral Sclerosis Awareness Month and memorializes Congress to enact legislation to provide additional funding for research in order to find a treatment and a cure for amyotrophic lateral sclerosis.
Title
Recognizes May 2011 as Amyotrophic Lateral Sclerosis Awareness Month and memorializes Congress to enact legislation to provide additional funding for research in order to find a treatment and a cure for amyotrophic lateral sclerosis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 26, ADOPT (#98) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-23 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/20. | |
2011-05-17 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-05-12 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-05-11 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2011-05-11 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |
2011-05-10 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2011-05-09 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |