LA SCR23 | 2018 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/5/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/5/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Lynda Woolard, president of the Independent Women's Organization in New Orleans, on her achievements in supporting Democratic candidates as well as in lobbying the legislature on issues.
Title
Commends Lynda Woolard, president of the Independent Women's Organization in New Orleans, on her achievements in supporting Democratic candidates as well as in lobbying the legislature on issues.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 23 ADOPT (#50) (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/5/2018. |
2018-06-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2018-06-03 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2018-06-03 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2018-06-02 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 27 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |