LA SCR22 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializes Congress to extend the certification for an 8(a) business by one additional year if the business was certified by January 1, 2020.
Title
Memorializes Congress to extend the certification for an 8(a) business by one additional year if the business was certified by January 1, 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - House - House Vote on SCR 22 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#128) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 22 CO-AUTHORS (#68) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 22 ADOPT (#67) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 22 CO-AUTHORS (#68) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 22 ADOPT (#67) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020. |
2020-06-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2020-06-25 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 96 yeas, 0 nays. |
2020-06-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/25/20. |
2020-06-24 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-06-23 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2020-06-23 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |