LA SCR17 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-30 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/27/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-30 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/27/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Riverboat Economic Development and Gaming Task Force.
Title
Creates the Riverboat Economic Development and Gaming Task Force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-19 - House - House Vote on SCR 17 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#919) (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 17 ADOPT (#253) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 17 ADOPT (#253) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-30 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/27/2016. |
2016-05-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2016-05-19 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 76 yeas, 2 nays. |
2016-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2016. |
2016-05-12 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-05-11 | House | Reported favorably (8-0). |
2016-05-05 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-05-04 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2016-04-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2016-04-13 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |