LA SCR17 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-28 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/25.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-28 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/25.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Board of Regents and LCTCS to study the feasibility of merging Capital Area Technical College and Baton Rouge Community College.
Title
Requests the Board of Regents and LCTCS to study the feasibility of merging Capital Area Technical College and Baton Rouge Community College.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 17, ADOPT (#400) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-28 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/25. | |
2012-05-23 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-23 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-22 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2012-05-22 | Read by title, concurred in. | |
2012-05-21 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/2012. | |
2012-05-17 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | |
2012-05-16 | Reported favorably (10-0). | |
2012-04-19 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2012-04-18 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2012-04-17 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. | |
2012-04-16 | Reported with amendments. | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |