LA SCR121 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-13)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-13)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses sincere condolences upon the passing of Dr. Paul Whitfield Murrill, former chancellor of LSU.
Title
Expresses sincere condolences upon the passing of Dr. Paul Whitfield Murrill, former chancellor of LSU.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 121 ADOPT (#1251) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2018-05-18 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2018-05-17 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 25 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |