LA SCR10 | 2017 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 85-53-3)
Status: Passed on February 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-22 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 2/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 85-53-3)
Status: Passed on February 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-22 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 2/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses sincere condolences upon the passing of former legislator, Armand J. Brinkhaus.
Title
Expresses sincere condolences upon the passing of former legislator, Armand J. Brinkhaus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 10 ADOPT (#24) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-22 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 2/23/2017. |
2017-02-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-02-19 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2017-02-15 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2017-02-15 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |