LA SB90 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to a voluntary nonopioid directive form. (8/1/18) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to a voluntary nonopioid directive form. (8/1/18) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-27 - House - House Vote on SB 90 FINAL PASSAGE (#627) (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 90 FINAL PASSAGE (#71) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10SenateEffective date 8/1/2018.
2018-05-10SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 28.
2018-05-02SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2018-05-01HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-01SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-04-30SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2018-04-27HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-19HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/27/18.
2018-04-16HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-13HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2018-04-12HouseReported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-03-21HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2018-03-20HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2018-03-19SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-03-15SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-03-14SenateReported with amendments.
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2018-02-25SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=SB90&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1067178
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1075010
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1076530
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1091314
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097222
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1074743
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1067180
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1074619
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1075513
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1076040
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1075787
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1076583
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078434
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098362
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093315
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1076487
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1091017

Bill Comments

feedback