LA SB90 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-18-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Effective date 8/1/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-18-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Effective date 8/1/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expands crime of human trafficking to specific elements regarding trafficking of persons under the age of twenty-one engaged in commercial sexual activity. (8/1/16)
Title
Expands crime of human trafficking to specific elements regarding trafficking of persons under the age of twenty-one engaged in commercial sexual activity. (8/1/16)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 90 CONCUR (#855) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - House - House Vote on SB 90 FINAL PASSAGE (#803) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 90 CO-AUTHORS (#305) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 90 FINAL PASSAGE (#304) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - House - House Vote on SB 90 FINAL PASSAGE (#803) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 90 CO-AUTHORS (#305) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 90 FINAL PASSAGE (#304) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2016. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 269. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/20/2016. |
2016-05-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2016-05-16 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2016. |
2016-05-09 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-05-05 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2016-05-04 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-04-20 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2016-04-19 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |