LA SB90 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 44-20-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - Effective date 6/10/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 44-20-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - Effective date 6/10/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for certain requirements which must be met by a physician who performs an abortion. (gov sig)
Title
Provides for certain requirements which must be met by a physician who performs an abortion. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 90 CONCUR (#771) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 90 FINAL PASSAGE (#671) (Y: 99 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 90 CO-AUTHORS (#128) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 90 FINAL PASSAGE (#127) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 90 FINAL PASSAGE (#671) (Y: 99 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 90 CO-AUTHORS (#128) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 90 FINAL PASSAGE (#127) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-10 | Senate | Effective date 6/10/2013. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 259. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2013-06-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 2 nays. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2013-05-29 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 3. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/29/2013. |
2013-05-23 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-22 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2013-05-21 | House | Reported with amendments (18-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-04-24 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2013-04-23 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 2 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |