LA SB743 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Effective date 6/29/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Effective date 6/29/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the selection process for certain members, terms, and vacancies on the Legislative Youth Advisory Council, and for the submission of an annual report. (gov sig)
Title
Provides for the selection process for certain members, terms, and vacancies on the Legislative Youth Advisory Council, and for the submission of an annual report. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on SB 743, FINAL PASSAGE (#1697) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 743, FINAL PASSAGE (#703) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 743, FINAL PASSAGE (#703) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-29 | Effective date 6/29/10. | |
2010-06-29 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 670. | |
2010-06-20 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2010-06-18 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-18 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-17 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2010-06-17 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-06-11 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/17/2010. | |
2010-06-10 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-06-09 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-06-08 | Reported favorably (14-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-24 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-05-20 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-05-19 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-05-18 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-17 | Reported with amendments. | |
2010-04-20 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |