LA SB735 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-29 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 30, nays 68. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-29 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 30, nays 68. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the deputy commissioner of consumer advocacy. (8/1/12) (RE INCREASE SG EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the deputy commissioner of consumer advocacy. (8/1/12) (RE INCREASE SG EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 735, FINAL PASSAGE (#1261) (Y: 30 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 735, FINAL PASSAGE (#491) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 735, FINAL PASSAGE (#491) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 30, nays 68. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-05-24 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/29/2012. | |
2012-05-17 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-16 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-05-15 | Reported favorably (7-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-04-26 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2012-04-25 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-04-24 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-04-19 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-04-18 | Reported favorably. | |
2012-04-03 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |