LA SB728 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Effective date 6/29/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Effective date 6/29/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces the number of years of teaching experience needed by an out-of-state teacher to qualify for a La. teaching certificate without taking the PRAXIS from 4 to 3. (gov sig)
Title
Reduces the number of years of teaching experience needed by an out-of-state teacher to qualify for a La. teaching certificate without taking the PRAXIS from 4 to 3. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on SB 728, FINAL PASSAGE (#1771) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 728, FINAL PASSAGE (#516) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 728, FINAL PASSAGE (#516) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-29 | Effective date 6/29/10. | |
2010-06-29 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 669. | |
2010-06-21 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/22. | |
2010-06-20 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-20 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-18 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2010-06-18 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-06-17 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/18/2010. | |
2010-06-17 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent. | |
2010-06-16 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-06-15 | Reported favorably (12-0) (Local and Consent). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-11 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2010-05-10 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-05-10 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-05-04 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-03 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-04-20 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Education. |