LA SB722 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date 6/30/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date 6/30/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that campaign finance disclosure reports be searchable by name of the contributor. (gov sig) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Requires that campaign finance disclosure reports be searchable by name of the contributor. (gov sig) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on SB 722, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1951) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 722, ADOPT (#1989) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 722, REJECT (#1726) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 722, FINAL PASSAGE (#1356) (Y: 72 N: 18 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 722, AMENDMENT B-471, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1355) (Y: 39 N: 55 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House Vote on SB 722, AMENDMENT B-470, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1354) (Y: 47 N: 40 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 722, FINAL PASSAGE (#565) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 722, ADOPT (#1989) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 722, REJECT (#1726) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 722, FINAL PASSAGE (#1356) (Y: 72 N: 18 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 722, AMENDMENT B-471, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1355) (Y: 39 N: 55 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House Vote on SB 722, AMENDMENT B-470, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1354) (Y: 47 N: 40 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 722, FINAL PASSAGE (#565) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | Effective date 6/30/10. | |
2010-06-30 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 804. | |
2010-06-21 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/23. | |
2010-06-21 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-21 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/22/10. | |
2010-06-21 | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. | |
2010-06-21 | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. | |
2010-06-21 | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. | |
2010-06-21 | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2010-06-20 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/21/2010. | |
2010-06-20 | Conference committee report received. | |
2010-06-20 | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. | |
2010-06-18 | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. | |
2010-06-18 | House conferees appointed: Henry, Gallot, and Lorusso. | |
2010-06-17 | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. | |
2010-06-17 | Senate conference committee members appointed: Kostelka, Appel, and Murray. | |
2010-06-16 | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. | |
2010-06-16 | Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Conference Committee appointments pending. | |
2010-06-16 | Called from the calendar. | |
2010-06-15 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2010-06-11 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2010-06-10 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 72, nays 18. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-06-04 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/10/2010. | |
2010-05-27 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-05-26 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-05-25 | Reported with amendments (11-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-13 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-05-12 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-05-12 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-05-10 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-05 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | |
2010-04-19 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |