LA SB709 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to publication of the acts of the legislature. (1/1/11) (EN DECREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to publication of the acts of the legislature. (1/1/11) (EN DECREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on SB 709, FINAL PASSAGE (#1770) (Y: 80 N: 10 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 709, FINAL PASSAGE (#970) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 709, FINAL PASSAGE (#970) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | Effective date: See Act. | |
2010-06-30 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 802. | |
2010-06-21 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/22. | |
2010-06-20 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-20 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-18 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2010-06-18 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 80, nays 10. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-06-17 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/18/2010. | |
2010-06-17 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent. | |
2010-06-16 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-06-15 | Reported favorably (17-0) (Local and Consent). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-07 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-06-04 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-06-03 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-02 | Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-01 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | |
2010-05-11 | Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. | |
2010-05-10 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-05 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | |
2010-04-19 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |