LA SB61 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
Pending: House Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture and Rural Development Committee
Hearing: May 22 @ 9:30 am in Room 3
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the Louisiana Commission on Medicinal Plants. (gov sig) (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the Louisiana Commission on Medicinal Plants. (gov sig) (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 61 FINAL PASSAGE (#238) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2019-05-07HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-05-06SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 2 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-01SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-30SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2019-03-26SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB61&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1118859
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128998
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131535
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128949
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130999
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1118860
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124217
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130112
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130003
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131648
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131426

Bill Comments

feedback