LA SB606 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-01 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-01 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to expungement of records. (gov sig) (RE1 NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides relative to expungement of records. (gov sig) (RE1 NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-31 - House - House Vote on SB 606, FINAL PASSAGE (#1418) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 606, FINAL PASSAGE (#572) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 606, FINAL PASSAGE (#572) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2012-06-01 | Rules suspended | |
2012-06-01 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2012-05-31 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-24 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/31/2012. | |
2012-05-24 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-23 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-05-22 | Reported with amendments (8-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-05-02 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2012-05-01 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-04-30 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-04-25 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-04-24 | Reported with amendments. | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. | |
2012-03-02 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |