LA SB590 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-14 - Effective date 7/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-14 - Effective date 7/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the elimination of certain special funds in the state treasury. (7/1/12) (EN +$66,950 GF RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the elimination of certain special funds in the state treasury. (7/1/12) (EN +$66,950 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. John Alario [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 590, CONCUR (#1708) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 590, FINAL PASSAGE (#1468) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 590, FINAL PASSAGE (#1172) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 590, FINAL PASSAGE (#1468) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 590, FINAL PASSAGE (#1172) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-14 | Effective date 7/1/12. | |
2012-06-14 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 834. | |
2012-06-04 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2012-06-04 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-06-04 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-06-03 | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2012-06-03 | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. | |
2012-06-03 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2012-06-03 | Rules suspended | |
2012-06-01 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2012-06-01 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-31 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/1/2012. | |
2012-05-31 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-30 | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-05-29 | Reported with amendments (13-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-05-23 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2012-05-22 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-05-21 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-05-17 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-05-16 | Reported with amendments. | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance. | |
2012-03-02 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance. |