LA SB574 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-08 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-08 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to changes of liability for payment of taxes during the redemptive period after a tax sale. (8/1/12) (RE SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to changes of liability for payment of taxes during the redemptive period after a tax sale. (8/1/12) (RE SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 574, FINAL PASSAGE (#739) (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2012-05-07 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-05-03 | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 26 yeas and 3 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-05-02 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-05-01 | Reported with amendments. | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | |
2012-03-02 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |