LA SB552 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-04 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-04 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain state departments to develop and submit annual reports providing statistics on women by race and ethnic groups. (8/1/12) (RE NO IMPACT EX See Note)
Title
Requires certain state departments to develop and submit annual reports providing statistics on women by race and ethnic groups. (8/1/12) (RE NO IMPACT EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 552, FINAL PASSAGE (#229) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |
2012-04-03 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-04-02 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-03-29 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-03-28 | Reported with amendments. | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | |
2012-03-02 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |