LA SB515 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date 5/15/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date 5/15/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Designates a portion of LA 377 as the "Sgt. S. E. Howell, Jr. Memorial Highway". (gov sig)
Title
Designates a portion of LA 377 as the "Sgt. S. E. Howell, Jr. Memorial Highway". (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - House - House Vote on SB 515 FINAL PASSAGE (#816) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 515 FINAL PASSAGE (#377) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 515 FINAL PASSAGE (#377) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Effective date 5/15/2018. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 249. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2018-05-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2018-05-08 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/08/18. |
2018-04-25 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-24 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-04-23 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2018-04-11 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |