LA SB505 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the assessment, payment, and allocation of ad valorem taxes. (See Act) (RE SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the assessment, payment, and allocation of ad valorem taxes. (See Act) (RE SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 505 FINAL PASSAGE (#350) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2024-04-23 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 2 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Substitute for Senate Bill No. 393. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |