LA SB505 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-30 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-30 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to drilling units. (8/1/12) (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to drilling units. (8/1/12) (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 505, FINAL PASSAGE (#530) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-30 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2012-05-24 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/30/2012. | |
2012-05-21 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-17 | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-05-16 | Reported with amendments (11-0-1) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-04-30 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | |
2012-04-26 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-04-25 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-04-24 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-04-23 | Reported with amendments. | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. | |
2012-03-02 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |