LA SB50 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Effective date 6/30/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Effective date 6/30/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Re-creates the Department of Agriculture and Forestry. (6/30/10)
Title
Re-creates the Department of Agriculture and Forestry. (6/30/10)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on SB 50, FINAL PASSAGE (#841) (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 36 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 50, FINAL PASSAGE (#112) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 50, FINAL PASSAGE (#112) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Effective date 6/30/10. | |
2010-05-26 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 14. | |
2010-05-19 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2010-05-18 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-05-17 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-05-17 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2010-05-13 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 67, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-05-07 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 13, 2010. | |
2010-04-27 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-04-26 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-04-22 | Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-04-14 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. | |
2010-04-13 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-04-12 | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-04-08 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-04-07 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. | |
2010-03-08 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |