LA SB499 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date 5/23/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date 5/23/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the legislative auditor shall make a best practices list available to local auditees. (gov sig) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides that the legislative auditor shall make a best practices list available to local auditees. (gov sig) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - House - House Vote on SB 499 FINAL PASSAGE (#1103) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 499 FINAL PASSAGE (#466) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 499 FINAL PASSAGE (#466) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Senate | Effective date 5/23/2018. |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 470. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2018-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2018-05-15 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/18. |
2018-05-07 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-03 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-05-02 | House | Reported favorably (7-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-23 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-04-19 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |