LA SB499 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-19 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-19 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the State Bond Commission from approving bonds, notes, or other indebtedness of certain political subdivisions against whom there is an unpaid final, nonappealable judgment issued by a court of competent jurisdiction for amounts owed for services performed under contract. (8/1/12) (RE INCREASE SG EX See Note)
Title
Prohibits the State Bond Commission from approving bonds, notes, or other indebtedness of certain political subdivisions against whom there is an unpaid final, nonappealable judgment issued by a court of competent jurisdiction for amounts owed for services performed under contract. (8/1/12) (RE INCREASE SG EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Neil Riser [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 499, FINAL PASSAGE (#410) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 499, AMENDMENT # 2633 BY ADLEY, SB 499 BY RISER (#409) (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 499, AMENDMENT # 2622 BY GALLOT, SB 499 BY RISER (#408) (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 499, AMENDMENT # 2626 BY MILLS, SB 499 BY RISER (#407) (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 499, AMENDMENT # 2633 BY ADLEY, SB 499 BY RISER (#409) (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 499, AMENDMENT # 2622 BY GALLOT, SB 499 BY RISER (#408) (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 499, AMENDMENT # 2626 BY MILLS, SB 499 BY RISER (#407) (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-19 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2012-04-18 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-04-17 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 12 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-04-17 | Called from the Calendar. | |
2012-04-09 | The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2012-04-09 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. | |
2012-04-03 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-04-02 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | |
2012-03-02 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |