LA SB486 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Effective date 7/1/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Effective date 7/1/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allows an alternative eligibility requirement of attainment of the WorkKeys silver level score, in lieu of the minimum ACT score required of students for a TOPS-Tech Award. (7/1/10) (EN +$21,903 SG EX See Note)
Title
Allows an alternative eligibility requirement of attainment of the WorkKeys silver level score, in lieu of the minimum ACT score required of students for a TOPS-Tech Award. (7/1/10) (EN +$21,903 SG EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on SB 486, FINAL PASSAGE (#1580) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 486, FINAL PASSAGE (#187) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 486, FINAL PASSAGE (#187) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-29 | Effective date 7/1/10. | |
2010-06-29 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 647. | |
2010-06-18 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2010-06-17 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-17 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-16 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2010-06-16 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-06-16 | Called from the calendar. | |
2010-06-10 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/16/2010. | |
2010-06-10 | Notice given. | |
2010-06-10 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2010-06-04 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/10/2010. | |
2010-05-27 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-05-26 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-05-25 | Reported favorably (14-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-04-15 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2010-04-14 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-04-14 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-04-13 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-04-12 | Reported with amendments. | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Education. | |
2010-03-19 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Education. |