LA SB485 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-19 - Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 518.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-19 - Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 518.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the St. Tammany Parish Hospital Service District No. 2. (8/1/20)
Title
Provides relative to the St. Tammany Parish Hospital Service District No. 2. (8/1/20)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-19 | Senate | Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 518. |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Reported by substitute. |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2020-03-31 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |