LA SB467 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-9-2)
Status: Passed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Effective date 6/18/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-9-2)
Status: Passed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Effective date 6/18/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requires DOTD to initiate the necessary engineering, financial, and other studies to begin passenger rail service between Baton Rouge and New Orleans and along the Interstate 20 corridor. (gov sig)
Title
Requires DOTD to initiate the necessary engineering, financial, and other studies to begin passenger rail service between Baton Rouge and New Orleans and along the Interstate 20 corridor. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 467 CONCUR (#1368) (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 467 FINAL PASSAGE (#1503) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 467 FINAL PASSAGE (#607) (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 467 FINAL PASSAGE (#1503) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 467 FINAL PASSAGE (#607) (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-18 | Senate | Effective date 6/18/2022. |
2022-06-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 764. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022. |
2022-06-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 29 yeas and 4 nays. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2022-06-03 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-03 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-06-03 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-06-03 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-06-03 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-06-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2022. |
2022-05-25 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-24 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2022-05-23 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-18 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2022-05-17 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 9 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |