LA SB410 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the board membership of the Louisiana Energy and Power Authority. (8/1/24)
Title
Provides for the board membership of the Louisiana Energy and Power Authority. (8/1/24)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 410 FINAL PASSAGE (#266) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-04-29 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2024-04-09 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |