LA SB406 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date 8/15/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amends provisions regarding criminal background checks. (8/15/10)
Title
Amends provisions regarding criminal background checks. (8/15/10)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 406, CONCUR (#1718) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 406, AMENDMENT B-490, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1543) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 406, FINAL PASSAGE (#746) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on SB 406, AMENDMENT B-490, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1543) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 406, FINAL PASSAGE (#746) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | Effective date 8/15/10. | |
2010-06-30 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 781. | |
2010-06-18 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2010-06-17 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-17 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-16 | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2010-06-15 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2010-06-15 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-06-11 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/15/2010. | |
2010-06-07 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-06-04 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-06-03 | Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-26 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2010-05-25 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-05-24 | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-05-19 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-18 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Judiciary C. | |
2010-03-18 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Judiciary C. |