LA SB393 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Effective date 6/18/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Effective date 6/18/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the crime of possession of a firearm by a felon as a crime of violence. (gov sig)
Title
Designates the crime of possession of a firearm by a felon as a crime of violence. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 393 CONCUR (#1357) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 393 FINAL PASSAGE (#1486) (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 393 FINAL PASSAGE (#156) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 393 FINAL PASSAGE (#1486) (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 393 FINAL PASSAGE (#156) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-18 | Senate | Effective date 6/18/2022. |
2022-06-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 702. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022. |
2022-06-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2022-06-03 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 3. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-03 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-06-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2022. |
2022-06-02 | House | Notice given. |
2022-06-02 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-06-02 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2022. |
2022-06-01 | House | Notice given. |
2022-06-01 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-06-01 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-31 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2022. |
2022-05-31 | House | Notice given. |
2022-05-31 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/2022. |
2022-05-16 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-12 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2022-05-11 | House | Reported with amendments (8-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-04-06 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2022-04-05 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |