LA SB390 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the order of payment of judgments and compromises against the state, subject to funding. (gov sig) (EGF INCREASE SD EX See Note)
Title
Provides for the order of payment of judgments and compromises against the state, subject to funding. (gov sig) (EGF INCREASE SD EX See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Claitor [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 390 FINAL PASSAGE (#511) (Y: 8 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 8 yeas and 23 nays. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance. |