LA SB382 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-03 - By a vote of 21 yeas and 16 nays.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-03 - By a vote of 21 yeas and 16 nays.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to safety belts. (8/1/18)
Title
Provides relative to safety belts. (8/1/18)
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Hewitt [R] | Sen. Dale Erdey [R] | Sen. Gerald Long [R] | Sen. Edward Price [D] |
Sen. Gary Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 382 RECOMMIT (#227) (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | Senate | By a vote of 21 yeas and 16 nays. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |