LA SB378 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-07 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-07 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a pharmacist in a primary health professional shortage area to administer certain vaccines. (/8/1/12) (EN NO IMPACT GF EX See Note)
Title
Authorizes a pharmacist in a primary health professional shortage area to administer certain vaccines. (/8/1/12) (EN NO IMPACT GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-23 - House - House Vote on SB 378, FINAL PASSAGE (#1135) (Y: 76 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 378, FINAL PASSAGE (#582) (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 378, FINAL PASSAGE (#582) (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-07 | Effective date 8/1/12. | |
2012-06-07 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 651. | |
2012-05-29 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2012-05-29 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-28 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-28 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2012-05-23 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 76, nays 21. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-16 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/23/2012. | |
2012-05-14 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-11 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-05-09 | Reported favorably (9-6) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-05-01 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |
2012-04-30 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-04-30 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 26 yeas and 10 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-04-26 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-04-25 | Reported with amendments. | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |
2012-03-01 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |