LA SB367 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for medical examinations in workers' compensation cases. (8/1/12)
Title
Provides for medical examinations in workers' compensation cases. (8/1/12)
Sponsors
Rep. Neil Riser [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 367, CONCUR (#918) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - House - House Vote on SB 367, FINAL PASSAGE (#756) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 367, FINAL PASSAGE (#288) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - House - House Vote on SB 367, FINAL PASSAGE (#756) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 367, FINAL PASSAGE (#288) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Effective date 8/1/12. | |
2012-05-22 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 235. | |
2012-05-16 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2012-05-15 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-15 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-14 | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2012-05-10 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2012-05-09 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 103, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-04-30 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/9/2012. | |
2012-04-25 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-04-24 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-04-23 | Reported with amendments (12-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-04-11 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. | |
2012-04-10 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-04-09 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-04-03 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-04-02 | Reported with amendments. | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. | |
2012-03-01 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |