LA SB358 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to mandatory expulsion. (8/1/24)
Title
Provides relative to mandatory expulsion. (8/1/24)
Sponsors
Sen. Beth Mizell [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 358 FINAL PASSAGE (#371) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2024-04-23 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 7 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education |