LA SB358 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
Pending: House Civil Law and Procedure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
Pending: House Civil Law and Procedure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes and provides relative to certain electronic notarial acts. (8/1/19)
Title
Authorizes and provides relative to certain electronic notarial acts. (8/1/19)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 358 FINAL PASSAGE (#324) (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2018-04-11 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 3 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |