LA SB35 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - Effective date 6/10/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - Effective date 6/10/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for health action plans by the Department of Health and Hospitals. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides for health action plans by the Department of Health and Hospitals. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 35 FINAL PASSAGE (#689) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 35 CO-AUTHORS (#229) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 35 FINAL PASSAGE (#228) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 35 CO-AUTHORS (#229) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 35 FINAL PASSAGE (#228) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-10 | Senate | Effective date 6/10/2013. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 210. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2013-06-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2013-05-30 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/30/2013. |
2013-05-23 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent. |
2013-05-22 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2013-05-21 | House | Reported favorably (16-0) (Local and Consent). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-07 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2013-05-06 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |